NY S04831 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to public assistance employment programs; amends requirements for work participation.
Title
Relates to public assistance employment programs; amends requirements for work participation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |