NY S04863 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4863A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4863A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the sale of a non-indemnity legal service plan shall not constitute doing an insurance business in this state; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that the sale of a non-indemnity legal service plan shall not constitute doing an insurance business in this state; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4863A |
2024-01-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1186 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05047 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - print number 5047a