NY S04865 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to leasing of real property, in relation to extending the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to leasing of real property, in relation to extending the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7631 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1413 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07631 (Same As) 2015-06-30 - signed chap.33