NY S04869 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the jurisdiction of the St. Regis Mohawk tribal police.
Title
Relates to the jurisdiction of the St. Regis Mohawk tribal police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7256 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.934 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07256 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - signed chap.121