NY S04918 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Cortland until 2015.
Title
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Cortland until 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7186 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.892 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07186 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.226