NY S04935 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants recognized veterans' organization free use of pavilions at state parks, other state recreational facilities, and historic sites.
Title
Grants recognized veterans' organization free use of pavilions at state parks, other state recreational facilities, and historic sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.595 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08152 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - held for consideration in veterans' affairs