NY S04935 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the emergency allergy treatment act; authorizes the certification of persons to administer lifesaving treatment to individuals who have severe allergic reactions when a physician is not available; allows an authorized entity to acquire and stock a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors with a prescription; includes as authorized entities restaurants, recreation camps, youth sports leagues, theme parks and resorts, entertainment venues and sports arenas.
Title
Establishes the emergency allergy treatment act; authorizes the certification of persons to administer lifesaving treatment to individuals who have severe allergic reactions when a physician is not available; allows an authorized entity to acquire and stock a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors with a prescription; includes as authorized entities restaurants, recreation camps, youth sports leagues, theme parks and resorts, entertainment venues and sports arenas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1546 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4935A |
2015-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2015-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07349 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to health