NY S04968 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing vehicles containing three or more passengers to utilize the high occupancy lane on the Staten Island Expressway.
Title
Relates to allowing vehicles containing three or more passengers to utilize the high occupancy lane on the Staten Island Expressway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1373 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4968A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07142 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation