NY S04981 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting retired members to authorize a deduction from retirement benefits for membership dues in not-for-profit membership organizations.
Title
Relates to permitting retired members to authorize a deduction from retirement benefits for membership dues in not-for-profit membership organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.330 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09179 (Same As) 2014-03-26 - referred to governmental employees