NY S05002 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions.
Title
Relates to allowing certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6462 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.647 |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06462 (Same As) 2011-07-20 - signed chap.164