NY S05004 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the court discretionary authority to retain alternate jurors after final submission of the case.
Title
Grants the court discretionary authority to retain alternate jurors after final submission of the case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6553 |
2013-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.765 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06553 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.204