NY S05016 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes New York exemptions of a resident individual within the cost of living adjustment; makes such adjustment applicable to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2013.
Title
Includes New York exemptions of a resident individual within the cost of living adjustment; makes such adjustment applicable to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2013.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Dean Skelos [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5016C |
2012-05-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5016B |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5016A |
2011-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08149 (Same As) 2012-05-09 - print number 8149b