NY S05033 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a permanent order of protection in place.
Title
Requires companies to allow victims of domestic violence to cancel contracts when there is a permanent order of protection in place.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.770 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5033A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08018 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - print number 8018a