NY S05037 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Title
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-20 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-19 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-18 | 1ST REPORT CAL.351 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |