NY S05038 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5038A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5038A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes persons 17 years of age or older to register to vote.
Title
Authorizes persons 17 years of age or older to register to vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5038A |
2012-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2011-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07770 (Same As) 2012-02-06 - print number 7770a