NY S05049 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the statewide transportation authority reinvestment (STAR) act of 2019; exempts mass transit authorities from bond issuance charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the statewide transportation authority reinvestment (STAR) act of 2019; exempts mass transit authorities from bond issuance charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.735
2019-05-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-04-04SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07685 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback