NY S05057 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5057A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5057A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the rent board reform act of 2012; establishes rent adjustments, and removes certain provisions relating to vacancy leases.
Title
Establishes the rent board reform act of 2012; establishes rent adjustments, and removes certain provisions relating to vacancy leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5057A |
2012-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05567 (Same As) 2012-02-01 - print number 5567a