NY S05057 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the county of Nassau to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes; extends local government assistance programs in Nassau county.
Title
Extends the authority of the county of Nassau to impose additional sales and compensating use taxes; extends local government assistance programs in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.807 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |