NY S05059 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5059A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5059A
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; and relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Title
Authorizes the chief administrator of the courts to establish veterans treatment courts; and relates to the removal of certain actions to veterans treatment courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5059A |
2020-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08360 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - print number 8360a