NY S05060 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of medical services by physician assistants.
Title
Relates to the performance of medical services by physician assistants.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2014-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1494 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5060A |
2013-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03749 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to higher education