NY S05068 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the production of proof of insurance by the use of electronic transmission to portable electronic devices.
Title
Authorizes the production of proof of insurance by the use of electronic transmission to portable electronic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1437 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5068C |
2014-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5068B |
2014-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5068A |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1097 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07685 (Same As) 2014-05-07 - print number 7685b