NY S05073 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Title
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07363 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to local governments