NY S05083 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the village of Rye Brook occupancy tax for three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the village of Rye Brook occupancy tax for three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading cal.533
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6554
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.505
2019-04-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06554 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s5083

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback