NY S05084 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Title
Prohibits a person convicted of "Buster's Law" from owning or possessing a companion animal unless authorized by court order, after appropriate psychiatric or psychological testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.632 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1013 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01580 (Same As) 2012-05-08 - held for consideration in agriculture