NY S05093 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 5093A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 5093A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contract carriers of passengers by motor vehicle to provide federal Safety Measurement System (SMS) results to potential customers.
Title
Requires contract carriers of passengers by motor vehicle to provide federal Safety Measurement System (SMS) results to potential customers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5093A |
2012-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06775 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in transportation