NY S05109 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permissible conditions the court may impose in connection with an adjournment in contemplation of dismissal.
Title
Relates to permissible conditions the court may impose in connection with an adjournment in contemplation of dismissal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.904 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |