NY S05141 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5141A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5141A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the qualified solar manufacturer facilities and operations credit for businesses which manufacture solar energy equipment.
Title
Establishes the qualified solar manufacturer facilities and operations credit for businesses which manufacture solar energy equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5141A |
2012-02-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07566 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - print number 7566a