NY S05171 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances protections for homeowners who have paid contractors, subcontractors, and material suppliers for home improvements; enhances penalties, civil and criminal for violations of the consumer protection provisions of the Home Improvement Contracts article of the general business law; authorizes the attorney general to prosecute crimes under that article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances protections for homeowners who have paid contractors, subcontractors, and material suppliers for home improvements; enhances penalties, civil and criminal for violations of the consumer protection provisions of the Home Improvement Contracts article of the general business law; authorizes the attorney general to prosecute crimes under that article.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.876
2019-04-12SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00253 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback