NY S05203 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to public hearings following major power outages.
Title
Relates to public hearings following major power outages.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06922 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means