NY S05204 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contents of notice of meeting or election where special tax or tax to be collected in installments is to be voted on.
Title
Relates to contents of notice of meeting or election where special tax or tax to be collected in installments is to be voted on.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5204A |
2011-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08995 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in local governments