NY S05222 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Troy to alienate and convey waterfront real property referred to as the Scolite Site.
Title
Authorizes the city of Troy to alienate and convey waterfront real property referred to as the Scolite Site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.496 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.618 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7390 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1243 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07390 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5222