NY S05243 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants 5 minute grace period for parking violations which occur at the expiration of a specified period of time or at a specific time.
Title
Grants 5 minute grace period for parking violations which occur at the expiration of a specified period of time or at a specific time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1098 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |