NY S05257 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Housing Our Neighbors with Dignity act" in order to provide a mechanism for the state to finance the acquisition of distressed hotels and commercial office properties by the appropriate nonprofit organizations for the purpose of maintaining or increasing affordable housing.
Title
Enacts the "Housing Our Neighbors with Dignity act" in order to provide a mechanism for the state to finance the acquisition of distressed hotels and commercial office properties by the appropriate nonprofit organizations for the purpose of maintaining or increasing affordable housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.17 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.396 |
2021-08-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.721 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6593b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1642 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5257C |
2021-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5257B |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5257A |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06593 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5257c