NY S05294 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the financing of certain stand-alone clinical facilities by the dormitory authority.
Title
Authorizes the financing of certain stand-alone clinical facilities by the dormitory authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7279 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.721 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07279 (Same As) 2017-09-12 - signed chap.299