NY S05370 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an employee of a not-for-profit corporation serving as chair of the board.
Title
Relates to an employee of a not-for-profit corporation serving as chair of the board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1022 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5370B |
2016-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5370A |
2015-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07442 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A10205 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A10205 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions