NY S05372 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to distiller licenses.
Title
Relates to distiller licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1936 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.814 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |