NY S05383 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to application requirements for private or government entities that wish to provide electric service converting residential rental buildings from being mass-metered to submetered.
Title
Relates to application requirements for private or government entities that wish to provide electric service converting residential rental buildings from being mass-metered to submetered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-05-27 | PRINT NUMBER 5383A | |
2009-05-27 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07871 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to energy