NY S05399 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Names the wood frog the official amphibian of the state of New York.
Title
Names the wood frog the official amphibian of the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.966 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07303 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
S05304 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05304 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN