NY S05404 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5565A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5565A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain wholesalers authorized to sell beer at retail for off premises consumption to also sell certain grocery items.
Title
Authorizes certain wholesalers authorized to sell beer at retail for off premises consumption to also sell certain grocery items.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5565A |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1410 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5404A |
2012-06-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.943 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05565 (Same As) 2013-01-25 - signed chap.505