NY S05453 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when there is an involuntary admittance to an in-patient facility, the person's or the person's designee's choice of facility shall be respected as long as it is appropriate; provided, however, such choice shall be subject to the facility's ability to provide the person's necessary level of care and the availability of space.
Title
Provides that when there is an involuntary admittance to an in-patient facility, the person's or the person's designee's choice of facility shall be respected as long as it is appropriate; provided, however, such choice shall be subject to the facility's ability to provide the person's necessary level of care and the availability of space.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED 5453A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1137 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |