NY S05461 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - PRINT NUMBER 5461B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - PRINT NUMBER 5461B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from holding public office or positions of political party leadership for a period of ten years when convicted of certain felonies and prohibits such persons from joining a political party for a period of five years following the completion of any sentence for such felony conviction.
Title
Prohibits persons from holding public office or positions of political party leadership for a period of ten years when convicted of certain felonies and prohibits such persons from joining a political party for a period of five years following the completion of any sentence for such felony conviction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5461B |
2014-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-04-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5461A |
2014-04-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |