NY S05461 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5461A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5461A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notifying recipients of STAR exemptions of statutory limits on savings increases in STAR exemption statements.
Title
Relates to notifying recipients of STAR exemptions of statutory limits on savings increases in STAR exemption statements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5461A |
2016-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1250 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07443 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - reported referred to ways and means