NY S05468 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts automatic renewal of contracts for electronic and life safety alarm services; makes such automatic renewal provisions unenforceable unless: the automatic renewal offer terms or continuous service offer terms are presented to the consumer in a clear and conspicuous manner; the business or person furnishing the electronic and life safety alarm service obtains the consumer's affirmative consent; and such renewal or continuous service offer provides an acknowledgment of the contract cancellation policy, and information regarding how to cancel in a manner that is capable of being retained by the consumer.
Title
Restricts automatic renewal of contracts for electronic and life safety alarm services; makes such automatic renewal provisions unenforceable unless: the automatic renewal offer terms or continuous service offer terms are presented to the consumer in a clear and conspicuous manner; the business or person furnishing the electronic and life safety alarm service obtains the consumer's affirmative consent; and such renewal or continuous service offer provides an acknowledgment of the contract cancellation policy, and information regarding how to cancel in a manner that is capable of being retained by the consumer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.936 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.998 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06191 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to judiciary