NY S05473 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5473A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5473A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enforcement of orders of child support against inmates; requires that inmates be notified of their right to seek modification of child support orders; provides a 180 day stay of enforcement following release; makes provisions permitting modification applicable to inmates incarcerated prior to effective date of such amendments.
Title
Relates to enforcement of orders of child support against inmates; requires that inmates be notified of their right to seek modification of child support orders; provides a 180 day stay of enforcement following release; makes provisions permitting modification applicable to inmates incarcerated prior to effective date of such amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5473A |
2012-03-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-03-07 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07931 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - print number 7931a