NY S05506 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits loan assignee liability with regard to motor vehicle retail installment contracts.
Title
Limits loan assignee liability with regard to motor vehicle retail installment contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.845 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1570 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5506A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07930 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - reported referred to codes