NY S05546 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits candidates from authorizing more than one political committee for any one election.
Title
Prohibits candidates from authorizing more than one political committee for any one election.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-24 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-18 | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 | |
2010-04-27 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-04-21 | PRINT NUMBER 5546A | |
2010-04-21 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-05-15 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A8756 (Same As) 2010-04-26 - print number 8756a