NY S05559 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the New York state department of health, to conduct a study on the high incidence of asthma in the borough of Manhattan in the city of New York and to prepare a remedial plan.
Title
Authorizes and directs the New York state department of health, to conduct a study on the high incidence of asthma in the borough of Manhattan in the city of New York and to prepare a remedial plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.227 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a7214 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.975 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07214 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5559