NY S05615 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voter enrollment.
Title
Relates to voter enrollment.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05751 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10843 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - referred to election law
A10843 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - referred to election law