NY S05634 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a remote maternal health services pilot program for Medicaid recipients; provides that such program shall be established during fiscal years 2024-2025, 2025-2026 and 2026-2027 to provide: remote maternal health services to eligible Medicaid recipients, medically necessary remote maternal health services to such eligible recipients for up to 12 months postpartum and payment to healthcare providers who provide remote maternal health services.
Title
Relates to establishing a remote maternal health services pilot program for Medicaid recipients; provides that such program shall be established during fiscal years 2024-2025, 2025-2026 and 2026-2027 to provide: remote maternal health services to eligible Medicaid recipients, medically necessary remote maternal health services to such eligible recipients for up to 12 months postpartum and payment to healthcare providers who provide remote maternal health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5634B |
2023-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5634A |
2023-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06080 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health