NY S05670 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any information or data produced internally or by an outside consultant used by the governor, the division of the budget, the department of health or any other relevant state agency to justify such reduction be made available to elected officials prior to funding reductions for hospitals and nursing homes.
Title
Requires any information or data produced internally or by an outside consultant used by the governor, the division of the budget, the department of health or any other relevant state agency to justify such reduction be made available to elected officials prior to funding reductions for hospitals and nursing homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.866 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1202 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06886 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means